Vaughn, Sr. v. Wegman et al
Plaintiff: Ray Lee Vaughn, Sr.
Defendant: C. Wegman and Bowman
Case Number: 1:2015cv01902
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant C. Wegman's Motion for Summary Judgment 50 should be GRANTED and that the Clerk of the Court be DIRECTED to enter Judgment against Plaintiff and for Defendant C. Wegman, an that this action be closed ;referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/1/2019. Objections to F&R due 21-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER on Plaintiff's request to postpone Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for copy of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 59 , 64 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER adopting 49 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION dismissing Defendant, Bowman pursuant to FRCP 4(m) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER notice and warning of requirements for opposing Defendant's 50 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/28/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss Defendant, Bowman pursuant to Rule 4(M) re 18 , 19 , 20 , 26 , 34 , 35 , 36 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F & R's due within 21-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER STRIKING 31 & 40 Plaintiff's Supplemental Briefs to First Amended Complaint and Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/2/2018. (Jessen, A)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to provide additional information for Defendant, Bowman signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/11/2017. ( Filing Deadline: 12/7/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to provide additional service information for Defendant, Bowman signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/10/2017. (21-Day Filing Deadline). (Lundstrom, T)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING Further Statement from United States Marshal Service on Service Efforts RE Defendant Bowman; 14 Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; referred to the Magistrate Judge for Service of Process, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/1/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed on Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Wegman and Chaplain Bowman for deprivation of Plaintiff's religious rights; Defendant Im am Howard and all claims against him be DISMISSED with prejudice from this action re 12 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Ray Lee Vaughn, Sr. ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/1/17. Objections to F&R : 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn, Sr. v. Wegman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Lee Vaughn, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Wegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?