February 25, 2021 |
Filing
127
ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Terminate Pending Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 2/25/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
|
July 14, 2020 |
Filing
112
ORDER DENYING 111 Motion Ex Parte Motion Regarding Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 07/14/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
June 24, 2020 |
Filing
110
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Ex Parte Application to modify Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines in Scheduling Order 108 ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion 103 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/24/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 1, 2020 |
Filing
105
ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion; Response Due in 21 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/29/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
|
March 16, 2020 |
Filing
102
ORDER DENYING 100 & 101 Plaintiff's Motions for Miscellaneous Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/13/2020. (Jessen, A)
|
February 27, 2020 |
Filing
99
ORDER to Modify the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/26/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/30/2020. (Jessen, A)
|
August 2, 2019 |
Filing
95
ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 83 Motion for Copy of Local Rules signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/2/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
|
July 3, 2019 |
Filing
94
ORDER VACATING ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM 91 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/3/2019. (JDP)
|
June 14, 2019 |
Filing
91
ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/14/19. (Marrujo, C)
|
April 2, 2019 |
Filing
85
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/2/19. ( Settlement Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.) (Marrujo, C)
|
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
84
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/14/2019. Attorney Jack Duran, Jr. for Roderick William Lear added. (Jessen, A)
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing
78
ORDER ADOPTING 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER DENYING Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 64 ; ORDER DENYING 69 Motion for an Immediate Resolution of all claims; ORDER DENYING 74 Motion for an Albino Hearing; This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/24/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 30, 2018 |
Filing
76
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS: (1) TO DENY Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; (2) TO DENY 51 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Exhaustion; (3) TO DENY 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Resolution of All C laims and Other Relief; and (4) TO DENY 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Albino Hearing and Other Relief re 31 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint; ORDER SETTING New Deadline for Dispositive Motions and Instructions to Defendants Regarding Service of This Order on Litigation Coordinator signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/30/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/2/2018. (Jessen, A)
|
June 28, 2018 |
Filing
68
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Opposition to Summary Judgment on Exhaustion, for Extensions, for Sanctions, for Leave to Submit Documents and for Appointment of Counsel,signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 06/27/18. 48 , 54 , 64 , 66 (Deadline Dates: 07/16/2018 and 09/3/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
May 15, 2018 |
Filing
65
ORDER ADOPTING 53 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 52 Motion for Court Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/14/18. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing
56
ORDER denying 49 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/30/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
|
March 12, 2018 |
Filing
53
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Request Pelican Bay State Prison to Issue Plaintiff H is Discovery Material and Legal Property; Forty-Five Day Deadline to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Fourteen Day Deadline to File Objections to Findings and Recommendation; Clerk to Serve Copy of This Order on Litigation Coordinator, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/9/18. (Copy of this order served via email on Litigation Coordinator at PBSP) (Marrujo, C)
|
January 11, 2018 |
Filing
50
ORDER Adopting 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/11/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
|
December 5, 2017 |
Filing
47
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Non-Cognizable Claims be Dismissed re 31 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/4/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting 44 Motion to modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/28/2017. Defendants' Deadline to submit a motion for summary judgment for failure to exhaust administrative remedies is extended to 1/22/2018.(Lundstrom, T)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing
32
ORDER DENYING 28 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER DENYING 29 30 Motions for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
|
May 10, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER Denying 22 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/9/16. (Gonzalez, R)
|
February 17, 2016 |
Filing
20
ORDER DENYING 18 Motion to Delay Consideration of Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/16/16. (Marrujo, C)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER DENYING 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/12/2016. (Jessen, A)
|
February 2, 2016 |
Filing
13
ORDER (1) GRANTING 6 & 9 Motions for Leave to Amend; and (2) GRANTING 10 & 12 Motions for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/1/16. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
|