The Board of Trustees et al v. Castillo et al
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, Cement Masons Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Cement Masons Vacation/Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California and Cement Masons Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Samuel Magana Castillo and Concrete By SMC
Case Number: 1:2015mc00037
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING THAT DEFENDANT'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BE DENIED signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/5/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendant's Claim of Exemption be Denied re 8 ; Objections Due Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/8/2015. (Martinez, A)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER That U.S. Marshal Not Release Property Claimed as Exempt Until District Court Rules on Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/4/2015. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees et al v. Castillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Concepcion Elisa Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Tracy L Mainguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion Elisa Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Tracy L Mainguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons Vacation/Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion Elisa Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Tracy L Mainguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion Elisa Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Tracy L Mainguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Magana Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concrete By SMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?