Rivera-Martinez et al v. Kern County et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rivera-Martinez and Arturo Martinez
Defendant: Kern County, Kern County Department of Human Services, Stephanie Meek and Philip Hyden, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00062
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER Directing Clerk to Enter Judgment of Dismissal and Close the Case signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 12/4/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 11/15/2018. Pretrial Conference RESET for 12/4/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon. (Jessen, A)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER Setting Final Pretrial Conference Via Video Conference signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 11/14/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon. (Jessen, A)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER ADVANCING the Time for the Settlement Conference; ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/31/2018. Settlement Conference ADVANCED to 10/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER After Hearing, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 7/13/2018. (Valdez, E)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER re supplemental filing, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 6/15/2018. (Kusamura, W)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER re Stipulation and Proposed Order for extension of time, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 6/7/2018. (Kusamura, W)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER setting trial signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 6/6/2018. Jury Trial set for 1/28/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon. (Lundstrom, T)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER re Scheduling, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 5/23/2018. (Valdez, E)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER setting a Telephonic Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 5/10/2018. (Kusamura, W)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER as to 227 Stipulation to Continue the Telephonic Conference; Court will contact counsel on or after May 16, 2018, to set up a telephone conference to fashion a schedule, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 05/07/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER regarding setting a Telephonic Status Conference on 5/7/2018, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/3/2018. (Kusamura, W)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Granting Motion and Vacating Trial, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 12/8/2017. (Valdez, E)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Setting a Telephonic Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 12/5/2017. (Kusamura, W)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING 159 Motion Augment Schedule, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 11/8/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DENYING 69 Motion to Strike, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 10/31/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER re Motion to Modify, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 10/24/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re: Exhibits, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 10/13/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re: Scheduling Order, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 10/12/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER re Admitting Exhibits, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 10/11/2017. (Kusamura, W)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Continuing the Status Conference currently set for 9/29/2017 to 10/12/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 9/25/2017. (Kusamura, W)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER setting Status Conference set for 9/29/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 9/12/2017. (Kusamura, W)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER setting Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon and re-setting Jury Trial currently set for 12/12/2017 is advanced to 12/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 9/11/2017. (Kusamura, W)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re: Extension for Deposition Designation, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 9/7/2017. (Kusamura, W)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re: Motions in Limine, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 9/1/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER for Amended Expert Disclosure, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 8/14/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER setting further Motion, Hearing set for 8/31/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 8/9/2017. (Kusamura, W)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Denying 99 Request for Settlement Conference by Judicial Officer signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 07/24/2017. (Flores, E)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 62 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Second Expert Witness Designation ; ORDER to DISMISS with prejudice, Defendant Philip Hyden, M.D., signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 05/26/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 63 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 5/25/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re Disclosures, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 5/19/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: Schedule for case, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/18/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING 45 Motion to Amend the Complaint and other Scheduling matters, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/14/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re Hearing on Motion to Amend signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 3/14/2017. If Plaintiffs proceed with their request for leave to file an amended complaint, the Court will conduct a hearing on the request via videoconference on 4/4/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon. (Jessen, A)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/8/2017, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 3/8/2017. (Kusamura, W)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of Reassignment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/22/2017. This action is reassigned to District Judge Sam E. Haddon. The new case number is 1:16-cv-00062-SEH. (Lundstrom, T)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER After Informal Telephonic Conference re: Discovery Dispute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/10/2017. (Hall, S)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING 31 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/31/2017. (Hall, S)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER 26 to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/31/2016. Mid-Discovery Status Conference CONTINUED to 1/6/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Dr. Hayden to file his amended answer within 5 days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2016. (Kusamura, W)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/21/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 9/19/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 7/8/2016; Non-Expert 3/10/2017; Expert 5/19/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set fo r 11/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/2/2017; Hearing by 6/30/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/7/2017; Hearing by 8 /22/2017. Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Martinez et al v. Kern County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rivera-Martinez
Represented By: Rebecca Doreen Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Martinez
Represented By: Rebecca Doreen Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Hyden, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?