McRoberts v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jason Daniel McRoberts
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00086
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR THE AWARD AND PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), AND COSTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1920, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/26/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Jason McRoberts and Against Defendant Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/30/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is ordered to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for a failure to comply with this Courts order. Defendant is ORDERED to file a written response to this Order to Show Cause WITHIN twenty (20) days of the dat e of this Order. If Defendant desires more time to file a brief, it should so state in the response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause within the time specified may result in monetary or other sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/19/2016. (Valdez, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRoberts v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Daniel McRoberts
Represented By: James S. Pi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?