Mathein v. Pier 1 Imports, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Mathein
Defendant: Pier 1 Imports, Inc. and Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00087
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Enhancement Awards, re 52 , 53 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/26/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Regarding Preliminarily Approved Class Settlement Administration Costs, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/12/2018. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 42 and 48 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/11/17. Hearing for Proposed Settlement is April 17, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. before U.S. District Judge Drozd in Courtroom 5. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Terminated Pier 1 Imports, Inc. From This Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/21/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS on or before 9/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/16/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER on Plaintiff's 28 Application to Extend Page Limitation for Their Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/27/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Joint Stipulation Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to File a Motion for Class Certification, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/2/2017. (Court sets the following deadlines; discovery due by 4/21/2017, motion for class certification due by 5/19/2017, opposition due by 6/30/2017, any reply due by 7/21/2017, and Motion for Class Certification Hearing CONTINUED to 8/1/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.)(Gaumnitz, R)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Joint Stipulation Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to File a Motion for Class Certification, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/21/2016. (Class certification discovery deadline continued to 2/10/2017; Plaintiffs' ; motion for class certification is continued to 3/17/2017; Defendants' deadline to file an opposition 4/28/2017; Plaintiffs' reply if any due by 5/19/2017; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 6/6/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/2/2016. (Hernandez, M)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file her First Amended Complaint within seven (7) calendar days of the date this Order is filed; and Defendants response thereto shall be filed within twenty-eight (28) days after the First Amended Complaint is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/2/2016. (Hernandez, M)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Recusal and vacating Scheduling Conference date signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2016. New Case Number is 1:16-cv-00087-DAD-SAB.(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathein v. Pier 1 Imports, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Mathein
Represented By: Stanley D Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pier 1 Imports, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory William Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?