Fowler Packing Company, Inc. et al v. Lanier et al
Plaintiff: Fowler Packing Company, Inc. and Gerawan Farming, Inc.
Defendant: David M. Lanier, Christine Baker and Julie A. Su
Case Number: 1:2016cv00106
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Terminate Enrique A. Monagas as Counsel of Record for Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/18. Christine Baker (in her official capacity as the Director of the Department of Industrial Relations) terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 69 Request to File a Response to Amicus Curiae Brief, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/26/2017. (The court grants leave for plaintiffs to file a response to the amicus brief by no later than 11/7/2017.)(Gaumnitz, R)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/23/2017. (Flores, E)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOLLOWING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/31/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: On or before July 14, 2017, the parties shall file a notice informing the Court if they have agreed to a stipulated statement of facts in this action and a proposed briefing schedule based upon such stipulation. If the parties are unable to agree to stipulated facts, the Court shall set a further scheduling conference upon receipt of the notice. (Hernandez, M)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT IS DUE MAY 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference to 5/31/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling report is due one week before the conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/4/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/07/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 15 Leave to File Amicus Brief, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/6/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of RECUSAL and Random Reasssignment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/6/16: District Judge Anthony W. Ishii recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill for all further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on Parties' Stipulation; Motion Hearing currently set for 5/2/2016 is moved to 5/9/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/8/2016. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler Packing Company, Inc. et al v. Lanier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fowler Packing Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Abba Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerawan Farming, Inc.
Represented By: David Abba Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A. Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?