Owens v. Brixmor Arbor Faire Owner, LP et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Owens
Defendant: Brixmor Arbor Faire Owner, LP, Ernest Apple and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00109
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/20/16. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint stipulation to continue scheduling conference and extend time for Defendant Ernest Apple DBA L&L Hawaiian BBQ to respond to Plaintiff's complaint; Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/20/2016. (Response due by 6/7/2016; Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/29/2016 has been CONTINUED to 6/29/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean)(Rosales, O)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 4/18/2016 for receipt of defendant Ernest Apple, dba L & L Hawaiian BBQ, to file a responsive pleading. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/1/2016. (Rooney, M)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 3/31/2016 for receipt of defendant, Brixmor Arbor Faire Owner, LP's, responsive pleading. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/18/2016. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Brixmor Arbor Faire Owner, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Owens
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brixmor Arbor Faire Owner, LP
Represented By: Kathy H. Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Apple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?