Morse v. County of Merced et al
Plaintiff: Ethan Morse
Defendant: County of Merced, Charles Hale, Erick Macias, Merced County Sheriff's Department and Jose Sam Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2016cv00142
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT and DISMISSING Case with Prejudice signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/20/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER EXTENDING Deadline to File Dispositional Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/4/2018. Dispositional Docs due by 9/19/2018. (Jessen, A)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER Denying 297 Motion to Amend Judgment Under Rule 59, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/16/2018. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 JUDGMENT dated *5/9/2018* in favor of plaintiff Ethan Morse and against defendants County of Merced, Charles Hale, and Erick Macias, and in favor of defendant Jose Sam Sanchez and against Ethan Morse according to the jury special verdicts returned in open court on May 4, 2018, and May 8, 2018. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Gaumnitz, R)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/20/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 109 Stipulation to Move Trial Date, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/31/2017. (Jury Trial previously set for 2/21/2018, is CONTINUED to 4/17/2018, at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 61 65 66 Motions for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/11/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER of DISMISSAL with Prejudice of Defamation Claims against Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/17/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For these reasons, the Court shall deny the parties stipulation to continue the settlement conference in this action. The parties shall be required to appear on May 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. and be prepared to conduct settlement negotiations in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/15/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Extending Page Limitation for Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/18/2017. (Any motion for summary judgment be filed in this action and any opposition thereto shall each be no more than thirty-one (31) pages in length.)(Thorp, J)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order. The dates and pretrial deadlines are continued as follows: Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off date: 3/10/2017. Expert Disclosures date: 4/7/2017. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures date: 4/21/201 7. Expert Discovery Cut-Off date: 5/9/2017. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 5/9/2017. Dead to file opposition to Dispositive Motions: 5/23/2017. Deadline to file Reply to Dispositive Motions: 5/30/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/ 2017, at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2017, at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. All other dates in the 9/8/2016, Scheduling Order 52 will remain the same. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/7/2017. (Timken, A)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER on PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Confidential Documents 53 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/2/2016. (Timken, A)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying Defendants' 32 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER Denying Defendants' Second 39 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/25/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/13/2016. (Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within twenty-one days of service of this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/25/2016. ( 6 Motion to Dismiss previously set for hearing on 3/15/2016, is CONTINUED to 4/5/2016, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. All briefing deadlines will be governed by the new hearing date.)(Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse v. County of Merced et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Merced
Represented By: Dawn M. Flores-Oster
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hale
Represented By: Dawn M. Flores-Oster
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick Macias
Represented By: Dawn M. Flores-Oster
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merced County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Sam Sanchez
Represented By: Dawn M. Flores-Oster
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Morse
Represented By: Jayme L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?