Moore v. City of Shafter Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Christy V. Moore
Defendant: City of Shafter Corrections and Ardon
Case Number: 1:2016cv00145
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Defendant Ardon and to Close the 1 Action signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/19/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 6/4/2018. (Flores, E)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant Ardon should not be dismissed (Rule4(m) and the Action Closed 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/10/18. Show Cause Response due (21-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Provide Additional Information for Service of Process on Defendant Ardon; Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed on her Eighth Amendment Claim Against Defendant Arton, and Dismissing all other Defendants and Claims signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/28/2017. City of Shafter Corrections terminated.(Flores, E)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that for the reasons stated in the January 27, 2017 Screening Order and based on the above sequence of events, Plaintiff should be allowed to proceed solely on her claim under the Eighth Amendment, for delibe rate indifference to her serious medical needs, against Officer Ardon; all other claims and Defendants should be dismissed with prejudice re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/5/17. Objections to F&R (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. City of Shafter Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy V. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shafter Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?