Gobel v. Hauser & Hauser, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Rusty Gobel
Defendant: Hauser & Hauser, Inc., Kevin Hauser and Claudia Hauser
Case Number: 1:2016cv00146
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/01/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Disregarding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/2017. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Disregarding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/23/2017. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE Scheduling Conference from 7/19/2016 to 8/8/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/2016. (Hernandez, M)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 4/19/2016 to 7/19/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/12/2016. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gobel v. Hauser & Hauser, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Gobel
Represented By: Kevin M. Schwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hauser & Hauser, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?