Rosedale Union School District v. J.F., et al.
Plaintiff: Rosedale Union School District
Defendant: J. F.
Counter_claimant: J. F.
Counter_defendant: Rosedale Union School District
Case Number: 1:2016cv00147
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/16/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER to the PARTIES to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Their Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/10/2017. Show Cause Response due by 5/19/2017. (Hall, S)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re: J.F.'s Request for Additional Time 50 and the District's Status Report 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/2017. (Hall, S)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 46 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Stipulated Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/24/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 4/28/2017. (Hall, S)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART 42 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/5/2016. Stipulated Dismissal due by 3/24/2017. (Hall, S)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 42 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/2/2016. Stipulated Dismissal due by 3/24/2017. (Hall, S)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING 33 the Motion to Compel Compliance with the Settlement Agreement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/28/2016. (Hall, S)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/19/2016. Stipulated dismissal due by 12/2/2016. (Hall, S)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 27 Request to Seal Settlement Agreement and Release Attached as Exhibit 1 to Joint Application to Vacate Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/16/2016. (Hall, S)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Request to SEAL the Administrative Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/29/2016. (Hall, S)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/27/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline: 6/16/2016. Initial Disclosures/responses to outstanding discovery: 5/20/2016. Administrative Record due by 5/2/2016. Discovery Deadlines: No n-Expert 7/5/2016; Expert 8/3/2016. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/19/2016; Hearing by 9/16/2016. Motions for Summary Judgment Deadlines: Filed by 10/3/2016; Opposition by 11/28/2016; Replies by 12/12/2016; Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2017 at 09:30 AM. Bench Trial set for 2/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 8 the Motion to Appoint Jennifer Feige as Guardian ad Litem for J.F., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/11/2016. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosedale Union School District v. J.F., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosedale Union School District
Represented By: Kyle W Holmes
Represented By: Stacy L. Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. F.
Represented By: Diane Barbara Weissburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: J. F.
Represented By: Diane Barbara Weissburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rosedale Union School District
Represented By: Kyle W Holmes
Represented By: Stacy L. Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?