Jackson v. Davis, et al.
Plaintiff: George Jackson
Defendant: R. Davis and R. Fisher, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00148
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CLOSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/19/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER That Inmate George Jackson is No Longer Needed as a Witness in These Proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/27/2018. (Jessen, A)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING 45 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 20 , 45 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/2018: Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (ECF No. 20) is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport George Jackson, J-02225, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/27/18. (Marrujo, C)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/2/2018: Dispositive Motions deadline continued to 11/15/2018; Settlement Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Hellings, J)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's 20 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/8/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER on Stipulation to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/23/18. Discovery due by 6/26/2018., Dispositive Motions filed by 10/4/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 34 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 20 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/15/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's 20 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order; Fourteen Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/3/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 2/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS: (1) For Service of Cognizable Eighth Amendment Claim Against Defendant Johnson; and (2) To Dismiss All Other Claims and Defendants With Prejudice re 13 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/19/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION and Denying Preliminary Injunctive Relief 2 , 8 , 10 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/9/16. (Verduzco, M)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Petitioner's 8 MOTIONS for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 2 , 8 , 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/6/16. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Davis, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?