Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston et al v. County of Kern et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Traci Morales, Elijah Levingtson, Elizabeth Levingston, Elisha Levingston and D'Andre Gonzalez Levingston
Defendant: County of Kern, Kern County Sheriff's Department, Donny Youngblood, Hall Ambulance Service, Inc., Brenda Robinson and David Manriquez
Case Number: 1:2016cv00188
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JUDGMENT dated *03/15/18* pursuant to order (Martin-Gill, S)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING #58 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERED THAT the Court declines to exercise its supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs remaining state law claims and this case is remanded back to the Kern County Superior Court with respect to those remaining claims, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/14/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held in chambers and off the record on 1/30/2018; CASE NOT SETTLED. Plaintiffs Counsel Nichelle Jones present. Defendants Counsel Andrew Thomson present. (Hall, S)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #74 Request for Telephonic Appearance, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2018. (Hall, S)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 1/30/2018 Settlement Conference hearing by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, D'Andre Gonzalez Levingston, Elisha Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. Attorney Jones, Nichelle Denine added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Nichelle)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION and ORDER #72 for Dismissal of Entire Action as to Defendants Hall Ambulance Service, Inc. and Brenda Robinson ONLY, with Prejudice; Order Closing the Case as to these Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/17/2018. (Hall, S)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF HALL AMBULANCE SERVICE, INC. AND BRENDA ROBINSON WITH PREJUDICE by Hall Ambulance Service, Inc., Brenda Robinson. (Meissner, Christina)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/11/2018. Pretrial Conference set 2/5/2018, and Jury Trial set 4/3/2018, are VACATED pending the court's ruling on the #58 motion for summary judgment currently under submission; hearing dates will be reset if necessary. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting #54 Petition for Minor's Compromise signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/20/2017. Elisha Levingston and D'Andre Gonzalez Levingston added. Hall Ambulance Service, Inc. and Brenda Robinson terminated.(Flores, E)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 12/19/2017. #58 Motion for Summary Judgment argued and submitted, a written decision will issue. Plaintiffs' Counsel Nichelle Jones telephonically present. Andrew Thomson, Counsel for Defendants County of Kern and David Manriquez telephonically present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/14/2017; the #58 motion for summary judgment on calendar 12/19/2017, WILL BE HEARD at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236), at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing you must email Courtroom Deputy Renee Gaumnitz, at RGaumnitz@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DECLARATION of Nichelle D. Jones re #61 Supplement, #66 Order, #54 Petition. (Jones, Nichelle)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Requiring Further Supplementation, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/11/2017. (Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to further supplement their #54 petition for approval of a minor's compromise within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY by County of Kern, David Manriquez to RESPONSE to #58 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Thomson, Andrew)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY by County of Kern, David Manriquez to RESPONSE to #58 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Thomson, Andrew)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 EXHIBIT Compendium of Evidence re #62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales, Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, #58 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by David Manriquez, County of Kern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Manriquez Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Alvarez Deposition, #3 Exhibit C- Fox Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Farley Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - Rutter Deposition, #6 Exhibit F- Robinson Deposition, #7 Exhibit G - Patton Deposition, #8 Exhibit H - Levine Deposition, #9 Exhibit I - Amin Deposition, #10 Exhibit J - Trevino Deposition, #11 Exhibit K - Martinelli Deposition, #12 Exhibit L - Pietruska Deposition)(Jones, Nichelle)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEENDANTS' #58 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Statement Opposing Statement)(Jones, Nichelle) Modified (corrected document title to clarify the docket) on 12/6/2017 (Gaumnitz, R).
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SUPPLEMENT by Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales re 60 Motion Hearing,, #54 Petition. (Jones, Nichelle)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 11/21/2017. #54 Petition for Approval of Minors Compromise argued and submitted; a written decision will issue. After hearing from both parties the Court is granting plaintiff 7 days to supplement the record with evidence not already submitted. Plaintiffs' Counsel Nichelle Jones present. Defendants' Counsel Andrew Thomson and Christina Meissner present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Valdez, E)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/16/2017; the parties are encouraged to appear telephonically for the #54 petition for approval of minor's compromise on calendar 11/21/2017, and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236), at 9:30am. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing you must email Courtroom Deputy Renee Gaumnitz, at RGaumnitz@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by County of Kern, David Manriquez. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Evidence Volume of Defendants County of Kern and David Manriquez, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Evidence Volume- Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Evidence Volume - Portions of David Manriquez Deposition, #5 Declaration Exhibit C to Evidence Volume - Declaration of David Manriquez, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Evidence Volume - Portions of Brenda Robinson's Deposition, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Evidence Volume - Portions of Ryan Fox's Deposition, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Evidence Volume - Portions of Dr. Whitmore's deposition, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Evidence Volume - Autopsy Report by Coroner (Dr. Whitmore Deposition Exhibit B), #10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Evidence Volume - NMS Lab Report (Doctor Whitmore Deposition Exhibit C), #11 Exhibit Exhibit I to Evidence Volume - Portions of Dr. Pietruszka's Deposition, #12 Proof of Service Evidence Volume Proof of Service (Courtesy Copy to Court), #13 Notice of Lodging of Courtesy Copies of Deposition Transcripts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Thomson, Andrew)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DISMISSING Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Stipulation signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/6/2017. Defendant Donny Youngblood terminated. (Jessen, A)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [Proposed Order] by County of Kern, Kern County Sheriff's Department, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood. (Thomson, Andrew)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/20/2017. #54 Petition for approval of minor's compromise set for hearing on 11/21/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PETITION for Approval of Minor's Compromise by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Nichelle)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying #51 Request to Seal, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/19/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Good Faith Settlement of Defendants, Hall Ambulance Service, Inc. and Brenda Robinson by Hall Ambulance Service, Inc., Brenda Robinson. (Meissner, Christina)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. (Jones, Nichelle)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/7/2017: The Court has reviewed the joint report (Doc. #49 ) in which all counsel report the case is not in a settlement posture. Thus, the Court continues the settlement conference to 1/30/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Updated confidential settlement conference statements SHALL be lodged to JLTOrders@caed.uscourts.gov no later than 1/22/2018. The parties are urged to file their dispositive motions as soon as practicable. (Hall, S)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. (Jones, Nichelle)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/3/2017: After reviewing the confidential settlement conference statements, the Court is concerned that the matter is not in a settlement posture. No later than 8/7/2017, counsel SHALL file a joint report indicating whether they are prepared to compromise their positions at this time or whether the settlement conference would be more productive after dispositive motions are determined. If counsel believes dispositive motions should be determined first, they SHALL detail their anticipated time frame for filing the motion(s). (Hall, S)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Lodging Confidential Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement by County of Kern, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood. (Thomson, Andrew)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 Request to Permit Insurance Adjuster to be Available by Telephone at the Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2017. (Hall, S)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 8/9/2017 Settlement Conference hearing by Hall Ambulance Service, Inc., Brenda Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on request for telephonic appearance of adjuster)(Meissner, Christina)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/21/2017, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. MOTION HEARING filed by ECRO, Phone number 559-499-5928 or 559-499-5612 E-mail Fresno_ECRO@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 7/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2017. (Thorp, J)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #36 Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2017. (Hall, S)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by County of Kern, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood for proceedings held on 06-21-2017 before Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Court Reporter ECRO Fresno. (Thomson, Andrew)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: HEARING on #36 Motion for Protective Order held on 6/21/2017. Motion argued; submitted. Court to issue written decision. Plaintiffs Counsel Nichelle Jones (telephonic) present. Defendants Counsel Andrew Thomson and Christina Meissner (telephonic) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO/FTR- Hall. (Hall, S)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #39 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/21/2017. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 8/9/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Settlement Conference by Hall Ambulance Service, Inc., Brenda Robinson. (Meissner, Christina)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY by County of Kern, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood to RESPONSE to #36 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER Barring Youngblood's Deposition; Points and Authorities in Support of Motion; Declarations of Sheriff Youngblood and Andrew C. Thomson and Exhibits A-F. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew C. Thomson in Support of Reply to Opposition to the Motion for Protective Order; Exhibits A and B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration - Special Verdict Form in Lucero v. Kern County, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration - Appellate Opinion in Lucero v. Kern County et al.)(Thomson, Andrew)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPPOSITION by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales to #36 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER Barring Youngblood's Deposition; Points and Authorities in Support of Motion; Declarations of Sheriff Youngblood and Andrew C. Thomson and Exhibits A-F. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nichelle Jones, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Jones, Nichelle)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER Barring Youngblood's Deposition; Points and Authorities in Support of Motion; Declarations of Sheriff Youngblood and Andrew C. Thomson and Exhibits A-F by County of Kern, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kern County Sheriff Donny Youngblood, #2 Declaration Declaration of Andrew C. Thomson in Support of Defendant Sheriff Donny Youngblood's Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order Barring Youngblood's Deposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Taking Deposition of Sheriff Donny Youngblood, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Thomson, Andrew)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Hall Ambulance Service, Inc., Brenda Robinson.(Meissner, Christina)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER by County of Kern, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood.(Thomson, Andrew)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER After Informal Telephonic Conference; ORDER VACATING #29 Order Issued March 14, 2017; ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 6/30/2017; Expert 9/15/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/29/2017; Hearing by 10/27/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/17/2017; Hearing by 12/19/2017. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 2/5/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 4/3/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE held in chambers and off the record on 3/16/2017. Court to issue written Order. Plaintiffs Counsel N. Jones present. Defendants Counsel A. Thomson and C. Meissner present. (Hall, S)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Traci Morales, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston.(Jones, Nichelle)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/15/2017: The Court SETS an Informal Telephonic Conference re: Scheduling for 3/16/2017 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. To participate telephonically, each party shall dial (888) 557-8511 and enter Access Code 1652736. (Hall, S)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #27 Stipulation for a Court Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/2017. Status Conference SET for 4/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #26 Stipulation to Allow Plaintiffs to Amend Complaint to Add Omitted Heirs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/2017. Amended Compaint due by 3/17/2017. Motion to Stay #20 is MOOT. (Hall, S)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for a Court Conference to Amend the Scheduling Order by County of Kern. (Thomson, Andrew)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Allow Plaintiffs to Amend Complaint to Add Omitted Heirs by County of Kern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Thomson, Andrew)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER After Informal Telephonic Conference; ORDER GRANTING #22 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/1/2017. Stipulation to amend complaint due by 3/10/2017. Opposition to motion to stay due by 3/13/2017; Reply due by 3/17/2017. Expert discovery to be completed by 6/9/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/23/2017; Hearing by 7/21/2017. Dispositive Motions: Filed by 6/23/2017. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 11/6/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 1/9/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re: stipulation to amend the case schedule #22 held in chambers and off the record on 3/1/2017. Court to issue Order. Plaintiffs Counsel Nichelle Jones present. Defendants Counsel Andrew Thomson and Christina Meissner present. (Hall, S)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/1/2017: The Court SETS an Informal Telephonic Conference re: the stipulation to amend the case schedule #22 for 3/1/2017 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The parties SHALL participate in the conference by utilizing the conference call service dial-in instructions as provided by plaintiff's counsel. (Hall, S)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Augment Scheduling Order re #11 Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,, by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. (Jones, Nichelle)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/24/2017; Defendants' #20 Motion to Stay or Abate the Case Pending Required Joinder of Omitted Heirs previously set for 3/23/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston is rescheduled for 3/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are directed to comply with the Local Rules with respect to the briefing schedule. Defendants are further directed to clarify the scope of relief sought on this motion in their reply brief, i.e. whether defendants are simply seeking to stay discovery and/or also compel joinder. (Gaumnitz, R)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to STAY by County of Kern. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew C. Thomson in Support of County Defendant's Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration)(Thomson, Andrew)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Stipulation to Dismiss the Kern County Sheriff's Office, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/27/2017. Case Closed as to Defendant Kern County Sheriff's Office, Only. (Hall, S)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of the Kern County Sheriff's Office by County of Kern. (Thomson, Andrew)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Stipulation re: Testimony of Minor Plaintiffs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/17/2017. (Hall, S)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Re: Testimony of Minor Plaintiffs by County of Kern. (Thomson, Andrew)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/17/2016: In light of the information contained in the joint status report that discovery efforts are proceeding appropriately, the Court VACATES the Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 9:30 AM. Counsel are reminded of their obligation to complete all discovery within the time frames set forth in the Scheduling Order. (Hall, S)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by County of Kern, Kern County Sheriff's Department, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood. (Thomson, Andrew)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER #12 for Disclosure of Autopsy Photographs of Donald Maliik Levingston, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2016. (Hall, S)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Disclosure of Autopsy Photographs of Donald Maliik Levingston by County of Kern, Kern County Sheriff's Department, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood. (Thomson, Andrew)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/19/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 7/15/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 3/31/2017; Expert 5/5/2017; Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/19/2017; Hearing by 6/16/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadline: Filed by 5/19/2017. Settlement Conference set for 7/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/19/2016. Case SCHEDULED. Court to issue Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs Counsel N. Jones (telephonic) present. Defendants Counsel A. Thomson and D. Tropp (telephonic) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO/FTR (Hall). (Hall, S)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. (Jones, Nichelle)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Hall Ambulance Service, Inc., Brenda Robinson. Attorney Tropp, Deborah S. added. (Attachments: #1 Statement Hall Ambulance Service, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Tropp, Deborah)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER by County of Kern, Kern County Sheriff's Department, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Thomson, Andrew)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by County of Kern, Kern County Sheriff's Department, David Manriquez, Donny Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Thomson, Andrew)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION (text only):Please Disregard Plaintiffs' Filing #3 Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge; incorrect event selected. (Fahrney, E)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. (Jones, Nichelle)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston, Elizabeth Levingston, Elijah Levingtson, Traci Morales. (Jones, Nichelle)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-16-100101 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6308864) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 demand for Jury Trial, #4 Proof of Service)(Thomson, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston et al v. County of Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Youngblood
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall Ambulance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Christina N. Meissner
Represented By: Deborah S. Tropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Robinson
Represented By: Christina N. Meissner
Represented By: Deborah S. Tropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Manriquez
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Donald Maliik Levingston
Represented By: Nichelle Denine Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Morales
Represented By: Nichelle Denine Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Levingtson
Represented By: Nichelle Denine Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Levingston
Represented By: Nichelle Denine Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisha Levingston
Represented By: Nichelle Denine Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Andre Gonzalez Levingston
Represented By: Nichelle Denine Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?