Smith v. Pfeiffer
Petitioner: Jarmaal Smith
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer
Case Number: 1:2016cv00200
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Grant Respondent's 21 Motion to Dismiss and Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/2/17. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISCHARGING 12 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/9/17. (Marrujo, C)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Petition Should Not be Dismissed for Untimely Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/5/2017. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jarmaal Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?