Webber v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jason Alan Webber
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00217
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/14/17: The Clerk of this Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and against Plaintiff, Jason Alan Webber. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER for a Second Extension of Time for Defendant to File her Responsive Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/15/2017. (Kusamura, W)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER for a First Extension of Time for Defendant to File Her Responsive Brief: (1.) Defendants request for an extension of time is GRANTED; (2.) Defendant SHALL serve her responsive brief on or before February 3, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/5/2017. (Herman, H)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/19/16. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webber v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Alan Webber
Represented By: Vijay Jagdish Patel
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?