Cardenas et al v. Westside AG, Inc.
Plaintiff: Atsiri Cardenas, Raul Pina, Honoria Garcia, Andres Gonzalez, Florentina Pina, Sergio Velasco, Lupe Alvarez and Wilmar Ramirez
Defendant: Westside AG, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00255
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/16/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing deadlines for completion of class discovery, class certification briefing schedule and trial are as follows: Class Certification Discovery deadline 10/27/2017; Motion for Class Certification filing deadline 11/28/2017 ; Response/Opposition deadline 12/29/2017; Reply deadline 1/19/2018; Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Jury Trial set for 8/21/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/26/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/3/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order to continue deadlines for completion of discovery and class certification briefing schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/31/2017. (Class Certification Discovery due by 6/29/2017; Motion for Class Certification filed b y 7/31/2017; Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due by 8/31/2017; Reply due by 9/21/2017; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 10/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean ) (Rosales, O)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order on stipulation to continue deadlines for completion of discovery and class certification briefing schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2017. (Non expert Discovery due by 3/31/2017; Motion for Class Certification filed by 5/1/2017; Opposition due by 6/2/2017; Reply due by 6/23/2017; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 7/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean ) (Rosales, O)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Assigning Action to U.S. Magistrate Judge for all Purposes Pursuant to the Consent of all Parties signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/07/2016. New Case Number 1:16-cv-255 EPG. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas et al v. Westside AG, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atsiri Cardenas
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Pina
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honoria Garcia
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florentina Pina
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Velasco
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Alvarez
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmar Ramirez
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside AG, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?