Cardenas et al v. Westside AG, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Atsiri Cardenas, Raul Pina, Honoria Garcia, Andres Gonzalez, Florentina Pina, Sergio Velasco, Lupe Alvarez and Wilmar Ramirez |
Defendant: |
Westside AG, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00255 |
Filed: |
February 23, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Erica P. Grosjean |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence J. O'Neill |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 2 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 17, 2018 |
Filing
66
ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/16/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing
31
STIPULATION and ORDER continuing deadlines for completion of class discovery, class certification briefing schedule and trial are as follows: Class Certification Discovery deadline 10/27/2017; Motion for Class Certification filing deadline 11/28/2017 ; Response/Opposition deadline 12/29/2017; Reply deadline 1/19/2018; Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Jury Trial set for 8/21/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/26/2017. (Rooney, M)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Filing
26
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/3/2017. (Rooney, M)
|
February 1, 2017 |
Filing
24
Order to continue deadlines for completion of discovery and class certification briefing schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/31/2017. (Class Certification Discovery due by 6/29/2017; Motion for Class Certification filed b y 7/31/2017; Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due by 8/31/2017; Reply due by 9/21/2017; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 10/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean ) (Rosales, O)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing
21
Order on stipulation to continue deadlines for completion of discovery and class certification briefing schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2017. (Non expert Discovery due by 3/31/2017; Motion for Class Certification filed by 5/1/2017; Opposition due by 6/2/2017; Reply due by 6/23/2017; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 7/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean ) (Rosales, O)
|
July 7, 2016 |
Filing
13
ORDER Assigning Action to U.S. Magistrate Judge for all Purposes Pursuant to the Consent of all Parties signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/07/2016. New Case Number 1:16-cv-255 EPG. (Flores, E)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?