Garcia, et al v. Veneman, et al
Plaintiff: GLORIA MORALEZ
Defendant: Thomas J Vilsack
Case Number: 1:2016cv00282
Filed: March 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of standing signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/6/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFF' MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF STANDING, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/17/2017. (Kusamura, W)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S 434 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing currently set for 8/21/2017 is moved to 9/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/14/2017. (Kusamura, W)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER CONTINUING Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Setting Briefing Schedule, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/28/17. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Marrujo, C)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Protective Order (Doc. 430). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/24/2017. (Herman, H)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER VACATING Telephonic Conference Call Re Informal Discovery Resolution (for April 18, 2017 at 10:00a.m.). ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. 422), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/17/2017. (Herman, H)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER Denying in Part and Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Supsend and Reset Discovery Deadlines (Doc. 411). ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference: (1.) Plaintiff's motion to suspend discovery pending resolution of her motion f or reconsideration is DENIED as moot; (2.) Plaintiff's request to extend the non-expert liability discovery deadline following resolution of the motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. (3.) The deadline to complete non-expert liability disco very is EXTENDED sixty (60) days after service of this order; and (4.) The Court SETS a telephonic status conference regarding non-expert liability discovery for May 18, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before the undersigned. The parties may appear telephonically at the conference with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number: 1-877-411-9748; passcode: 3190866. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/12/2017. (Herman, H)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 406 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/7/2017. (Kusamura, W)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER denying Defendant's Motion for partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and granting Motion for partial Summary Judgment re 399 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/20/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Motion Hearing currently set for 10/31/2016 to 11/21/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/13/2016. (Kusamura, W)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 STIPULATION Protective ORDER: The Court has reviewed the stipulated protective order filed on September 1, 2016. (Doc. 397). For good cause appearing, and pursuant to the Stipulated Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Gloria Moralez and Defendant Thomas J. Vilsack, U.S. Department of Agriculture Secretary, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties Stipulated Protective Order is APPROVED in its entirety. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/2/2016. (Herman, H)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER TO RECAPTION CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/27/2016. (Jessen, A)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER Approving Stipulation to File Fourth Amended Complaint: (1) Plaintiff GLORIA P. MORALEZS request for leave to file a Fourth Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2) On or before May 13, 2016, Plaintiff shall file her Fourth Amended Complaint, atta ched as Exhibit 1 to the Stipulation, as a separate entry in the docket for purposes of clarifying the record; (3) On or before June 13, 2016, Defendant shall file his initial response to the Fourth Amended Complaint; (4) The Initial Scheduling C onference is continued from May 24, 2016 to July 27, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 8, before Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically fil ed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference, one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference. The parties are encouraged to appear at the mandatory scheduling conference by telephone by arranging a one-line conference call and then adding the Court at (559) 499-5789. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/11/2016. (Herman, H)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER DENYING Counsel's Pro Hac Vice Application signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/6/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia, et al v. Veneman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA MORALEZ
Represented By: Phillip Lawrence Fraas, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Vilsack
Represented By: Joseph Frueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?