Tenorio et al v. Gallardo et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Pedro, Ezequiel Aguilar, Irma Castaneda, Lucia Torres, Francisco Viera, Abel Miranda, Teresa Miranda, Lucaria Tenorio, Antonio Torres, Maria Teresa, Cristino Santiago, Maria De Jesus, Artemio Santiago and Pascuala Saucedo
Defendant: Nazar Kooner, Gabriel Gallardo, Manuel Gallardo, Silvia Esther Gallardo and Kern County Cultivation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00283
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING 135 Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/30/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs against the Gallardo Defendants 123 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/15/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER REQUIRING Filing of the Motion for Approval of the Settlement 127 by 5/17/2019., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/12/2019. (Hall, S)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2019. Settlement Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 109 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/2019. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING 92 , 93 , 94 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER GRANTING 78 , 79 , 80 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; ORDER STRIKING 47 & 52 Answers of Gabriel Gallardo, Sr., Silvia Gallardo, and Manuel Gallardo; and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Default Against Gabriel Gallardo, Sr., Silvia Gallardo, and Manuel Gallardo signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/6/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION and ORDER 95 to Modify Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/25/2018. Non-Expert discovery completed by 3/1/2018. (Hall, S)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting 80 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, Striking the Answer of Manuel Gallardo, and Entering Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/30/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING 85 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/2017. Non-expert discovery due by 2/1/2018. (Hall, S)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS STRIKING the Answer of Kern County Cultivation, Inc. and ENTERING Default 71 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/26/17. (Hellings, J)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING 72 the Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/8/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert and Expert 12/1/2017. (Hall, S)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Strike the Answer and Enter Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/3/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery; ORDER DROPPING FROM CALENDAR 44 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Kern County Cultivation, Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2017. (Hall, S)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/4/2017. (The court continues the hearing on counsel's motion to withdraw as attorney of record to May 2, 2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Defendants Gabriel Gallardo, Sr., Manuel Gallardo, and Silvia Gallardo are required to either personally appear at the May 2, 2017 hearing or to arrange for telephonic appearance through their counsel of record no later than seventy-two (72) hours before the May 2, 2017 hearing.) (Thorp, J)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 9/29/2017; Expert 12/1/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 12/15/2017; Hearing by 1/16/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/26/2018; Hearing by 3/6/2018. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 4/23/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 6/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Leave to Amend, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/19/2016. (1. Plaintiffs' 27 motion to amend and 28 amended motion to amend are granted; 2. Plaintiffs are granted leave to forthwith file and serve their second amen ded complaint, which adds Pawan S. Kooner, d/b/a Pawan Kooner Farms, and Hardeep Kauer as defendants; 3. The hearing set for 12/20/2016 at 11:00 a.m. on defendants' motion to amend is vacated; and 4. Upon appearance by the newly served defendants in this action, the assigned Magistrate Judge may consider whether the 19 Scheduling Order of 6/23/2016 should be modified further.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER 25 TO MODIFY SCHEDULE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/20/2016. Pleading amendment deadline 11/18/2016. (Hall, S)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to MODIFY SCHEDULE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/19/2016. Pleading amendment deadline 10/19/2016. (Hall, S)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/23/2016. Consent/Decline Deadline 7/5/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 9/19/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 7/25/2016; Non-Expert 3/27/2017; Expert 5/8/2017. Mid -Discovery Status Conference set for 12/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/15/2017; Hearing by 6/12/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadli nes: Filed by 6/27/2017; Hearing by 8/15/2017. Settlement Conference set for 4/7/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenorio et al v. Gallardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nazar Kooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Esther Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Cultivation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Pedro
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezequiel Aguilar
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Castaneda
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Torres
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Viera
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Miranda
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Miranda
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucaria Tenorio
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Torres
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristino Santiago
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Jesus
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artemio Santiago
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascuala Saucedo
Represented By: Sahar Durali
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Cynthia L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?