Curtis Anderson v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Anderson
Defendant: United States of America, Mark T. Hellner, Mercy Medical Center, P.A Hong and P.A. Egan
Case Number: 1:2016cv00352
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 92 Motion to Enforce Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Discharging Trial Subpoena Served on Unincarcerated Witness by the United States Marshal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/5/2019. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Regarding Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DISCHARGING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Curtis Anderson, #59975-004 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM Regarding Curtis Anderson, BOP#59975-004, to Appear by Video Conference for Settlement Conference on August 27, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/1/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/3/2019. Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE of Subpoena on Unincarcerated Witness by the United States Marshal; Service within Seven (7) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/25/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Obtain Attendance of Unincarcerated Witness Who Refuses to Testify Voluntarily signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/14/2019. Witness Fees due by 7/5/2019. (Jessen, A)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER correcting clerical mistake and amending Second Scheduling Order 64 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/13/2019. Bench Trial set for 10/1/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Lundstrom, T)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ADOPTING 59 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Defendants' 55 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/19. (Marrujo, C)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 55 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED re 9 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint; and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Additional Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations in part and granting in part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 22 , 23 , 26 , 30 , 33 , 39 , 53 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 22 , 23 , 26 , 30 , 39 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re 9 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending dismissal of certain claims and defendants re 10 , 12 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A Drozd; Objections to F & R's due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISCHARGING 14 Order to Show Cause, and GRANTING 17 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File a Motion to Substitute the Doe Defendant(s) or File a Request for a Rule 45 Subpoena Within Forty-Five (45) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/2016. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Anderson v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Hellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?