Jefferson v. Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al

Plaintiff: Keon L. Jefferson, Sr
Defendant: Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, State of California, Wasco State Prison, Johal Amandeep, J. Lewis and John N. Katavich
Case Number: 1:2016cv00359
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 14 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Dismissing Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim; ORDER that this Dismissal is Subject to the "Three Strikes" Provision of 28 UC 1915(g), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/29/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 22, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Randomly Assign a District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Action be DISMISSED, With Prejudice, Based on Plaintiff's Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted re [1 2] Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2017. This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is 1:16-cv-00359-AWI-SAB (PC). Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
November 9, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/9/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Comply with a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute; Show Cause Response due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/2017. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keon L. Jefferson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johal Amandeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Katavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?