M.M. v. County of Kern et al
Plaintiff: M.M.
Defendant: County of Kern, Kern County Sheriff's Department, Scott Wall, Daniel Willis and Dennis Coffee
Case Number: 1:2016cv00376
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 STIPULATED DISMISSAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/23/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER to the PARTIES to SHOW CAUSE Why the Docket Should Not Be Updated to Reflect the Plaintiff's True Name, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/9/2018. Show Cause Response due by 2/23/2018. (Hall, S)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 46 Petition Terminating David Evankovich as Guardian ad Litem for Plaintiff M.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/8/2018. (Hall, S)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE; new case number 1:16-cv-00376 JLT, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/30/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER After Further Scheduling Conference; ORDER STAYING THE CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2017. Further Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2017 at 09:00 AM; joint report due one week in advance of hearing. (Hall, S)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Directing the Court to Close the Action as to the Kern County Sheriff's Department Only, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/2017. (Hall, S)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER 29 that the Video (#PM5) is Authentic and May Be Used as Evidence Without Further Authentication and/or Foundation, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2017. (Hall, S)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER After Mid-Discovery Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/2017. (Hall, S)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/18/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/13/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 11/10/2016; Non-Expert 6/30/2017; Expert 9/8/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/3/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/20/2017; Hearing by 10/18/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/31/2017; Hearing by 12/5/2017. Settlement Conference set for 12/8/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER STAYING ACTION, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/1/2016. (This action shall be stayed until 9/8/2016 under the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act, to allow Defendant Wall to return from overseas military deployment, authorize legal representation, and legally appear in this action.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/28/2016. (The court grants the 6 petition and appoints David Evankovich guardian ad litem of M.M., a minor and plaintiff to this action.)(Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.M. v. County of Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Represented By: Judith M. Denny
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Judith M. Denny
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Willis
Represented By: Judith M. Denny
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Coffee
Represented By: Judith M. Denny
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?