Atayde v. Napa State Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Lucy Atayde
Defendant: Napa State Hospital, Dolly Matteucci, Dana White, California Forensic Medical Group Inc., Taylor Fithian, M.D., heather goode, Sean Ryan, Deborah Mandujano, Corina Denning, Merced County, Tom Cavallero and Jason Goins
Case Number: 1:2016cv00398
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH FINANCIAL CONDITION DISCOVERY ORDERS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND FINDING OF CONTEMPT (Doc. No. 196 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/28/2020. (Gonzales, V)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DENYING 186 191 Requests for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's February 7, 2020 Order and March 4, 2020 Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/21/2020. (Flores, E)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXENDING TIME TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL. ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE DEFENSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/3/2020. (Hernandez, M)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re Informal Discovery Dispute GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Order Compelling Production. (Docs. 181, 183, 184) Defendants Dolly Matteucci, Dana White, Patricia Tyler, Cindy Black, and Diane Mond, shall produce, on or bef ore February 28, 2020, documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests for production, set four, subject to further meet and confer regarding the precise scope and breadth of the type of documents covered by the request. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/2020. (Timken, A)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST RE DISCOVERY DEADLINES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties stipulated request for extending the discovery deadlines for limited financial discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/2020. (Hernandez, M)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO FURTHER MEET AND CONFER. ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/2019. (Hernandez, M)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to TERMINATE Maya Sorenson as Attorney for Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting Joint ExParte Application 164 to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for Amendment of the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/23/19. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzalez, R)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CORRECT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling order, as amended on June 18, 2019, is further amended to change the dispositive motion filing deadline to January 10, 2020. All other aspects of the scheduling order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/2019. (Hernandez, M)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference Re Settlement RESET from 6/27/2019 to 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on the status of the settlement negotiations seven (7) days prior to the continued date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/24/2019. (Hernandez, M)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER RE THIRD STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER (ECF No. 149), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/18/2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling order is amended as follows: Status Conference re settlement: Remain as schedu led for June 27, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9, with the parties filing a joint status report concerning settlement by June 21, 2019. Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: October 18, 2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: November 1, 2019. Expert Disclosure Deadline: November, 1, 2019. Supplemental Expert Disclosure Deadline: November 15, 2019. Expert Discovery Deadline: December 20, 2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: January 10, 2019. Pre-trial Conference: April 27, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5 before United States District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Trial: June 23, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before United States District Judge Dale A. Drozd. All aspects of the scheduling order shall remain in effect.(Gonzales, V.)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 125 Motion to Amend the Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/6/2019. (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE STIPULATION RE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION. Pursuant to the agreement of all the parties in this action, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above stipulation is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/23/2019. (Hernandez, M)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A STATEMENT SIGNIFYING OPPOSITION OR NON-OPPOSITION TO STIPULATION RE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Taylor Fithian, Heather Goode, S ean Ryan, Deborah Mandujano, Corina Denning, Merced County, Tom Cavallero, and Jason Goins, shall file, on or before May 27, 2019, a statement signifying whether they oppose the entry of the stipulation filed on May 21, 2019 (ECF No. 136). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/22/2019. (Hernandez, M)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulation requesting an order shortening time (ECF No. 130) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/21/2019. (Hernandez, M)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2018. (Rooney, M)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION and ORDER Re: Confidential Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/29/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Re 104 Stipulated "First Look" Agreement re: Defendants' Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 Subpoenas seeking Plaintiff's Decedent's Medical and Medical Billings Records, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/21/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 & 78 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/25/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO JANUARY 23, 2017. The scheduling conference set for December 20, 2016, is CONTINUED to January 23, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9; and The parties shall file a new joint scheduling report one week prior t o the scheduling conference as to proposed dates only. The new joint scheduling report shall only contain proposed dates for the discovery plan, filing of non-dispositive and dispositive pre-trial motions, pre-trial conference, and trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE Scheduling Conference from 10/4/2016 to 12/20/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties are to submit their joint statement one week prior to the new Scheduling Conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/27/2016. (Hernandez, M)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting State Defendants' 49 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part County Defendants' 45 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/15/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atayde v. Napa State Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Atayde
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Thomas Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Glenn Michael Katon
Represented By: Sanjay Stephen Schmidt
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa State Hospital
Represented By: Jennifer Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolly Matteucci
Represented By: Jennifer Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana White
Represented By: Jennifer Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fithian, M.D.
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: heather goode
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Ryan
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Mandujano
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corina Denning
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merced County
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Cavallero
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Goins
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?