(PC) Grant v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: (PC) Grant and Travare Monroe Grant
Defendant: Lewis, J. Lewis, B. Adams, Charles E. Young and L. Clausell
Case Number: 1:2016cv00424
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #33 Motion for Dismissal /Waiver of Court fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/24/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #34 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief served on Travare Monroe Grant. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Dismissal of Court Fees by Travare Monroe Grant. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING without Prejudice Plaintiff's #31 Motion to Vacate Judgment; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #32 Order served on Travare Monroe Grant. (Sant Agata, S)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE to the Court Re Reconsideration Motion by Travare Monroe Grant. (Sant Agata, S)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT dated *11/13/2017* pursuant to #29 order. (Sant Agata, S)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Adopting #24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to DISMISS Amended Complaint with Prejudice for Failure/Inability to State a Claim signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/9/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #29 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #30 Judgment served on Travare Monroe Grant. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #27 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Appointment of Counsel signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/28/2017. Objections to F&R due by 10/31/2017. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #28 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Travare Monroe Grant. (Flores, E)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Travare Monroe Grant. (Flores, E)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations and ORDER DENYING #25 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/14/2017. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #26 Order on Motion served on Travare Monroe Grant. (Jessen, A)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE to the Court and REQUEST to EXTEND Objection Time Deadline and REQUEST for Court to Appoint Counsel Based on Mental Health Illness and Inability for Plaintiff to Represent Self by Travare Monroe Grant. (Jessen, A)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss #22 First Amended Complaint with Prejudice for Failure/Inability to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/30/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill.(Flores, E)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Travare Monroe Grant. (Flores, E)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE to the Court and Exceptional Request due to Institution Staff Mishandling Mail by Travare Monroe Grant. (Flores, E)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against B. Adams, L. Clausell, J. Lewis, Charles E. Young by Travare Monroe Grant.(Flores, E)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #20 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Travare Monroe Grant. (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to PO Box 290066, Represa, CA 95671, by Travare Monroe Grant. (Hellings, J)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING #1 Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; Amended Complaint due within Twenty-One Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #20 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Travare Monroe Grant. (Sant Agata, S)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to California Men's Colony, PO Box 8101, San Luis Obispo, CA 93409 by Travare Monroe Grant. (Gonzalez, R)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to KVSP, P.O. Box 5102, Delano, CA 93216 by Travare Monroe Grant. (Jessen, A)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to by Travare Monroe Grant. Address Remains the Same. (Flores, E)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Travare Monroe Grant. (Address on file is current). (Lundstrom, T)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CSP Corcoran P.O. Box 3461 Corcoran, CA 93212 by Travare Monroe Grant. (Lundstrom, T)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CSP Sacramento, P.O. Box 290066, Represa, CA 95671 by Travare Grant. (Jessen, A)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/21/16. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Travare Grant. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Travare Grant. (Marrujo, C)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Submit Correct Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/18/16. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order, served on Travare Grant. (Marrujo, C)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Travare Grant. (Marrujo, C)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case has been assigned to District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is 1:16-cv-00424-LJO-SKO (PC). (Marrujo, C)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Travare Grant. (Marrujo, C)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Docket Annotation served on Travare Grant. (Marrujo, C)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Travare Grant. (Marrujo, C)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/4/16. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Marrujo, C)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, served on Travare Grant. (Marrujo, C)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/2/2016 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Verduzco, M)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:16-cv-00650.
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Travare Grant. (Verduzco, M)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case transferred to District of United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of United States District Court for the Eastern District of California*.*2500 Tulare Street, Room 1501**Fresno, CA 93721-1318*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/24/2016. (Attachments: #1 Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl) (sjt). [Transferred from casd on 3/28/2016.]
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travare Grant. (skh) [Transferred from casd on 3/28/2016.]
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Travare Grant. (Filing fee $400.00; fee not paid; IFP filed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)The new case number is 3:16-cv-650-CAB-BLM. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (skh) (sjt). [Transferred from casd on 3/28/2016.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Grant v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: (PC) Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travare Monroe Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Clausell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?