King v. Martinez, et al.

Plaintiff: Mario King
Defendant: W. S. Wadkins
Case Number: 1:2016cv00433
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 93 ORDER DENYING 90 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as Untimely signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/13/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order 91 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 89 Motion to Stay Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as Moot and GRANTING Extension of Time to File 89 Objections to the Pending Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/30/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's 84 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/12/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Twenty-One (21) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 86 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Extend the Discovery Deadline to File a Motion to Compel re 82 , 83 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 85 ORDER denying 80 Motion to Compel and for Imposition of Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 77 ORDER DENYING As Moot Plaintiff's Objections to Court's Order to Re-Open Discovery 75 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/19/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 74 ORDER DENYING 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel but Extending Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines for Limited Purpose of Defendant Responding to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/13/2017. Discovery Responses due within forty-five (45) days. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/30/2017. (Jessen, A)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 73 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Re-Open Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/31/2017. (Flores, E)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 71 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendant's 64 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Notice of Withdrawal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/29/2017. (Flores, E)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 61 ORDER DISREGARDING 54 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Administratively TERMINATE Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 59 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's 58 Opposition to Defendant's Settlement Offer, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/28/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 57 ORDER Granting Defendant's 44 Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories, Set one, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 49 ORDER ADOOPTING 39 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/18/2017.(Flores, E)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order 47 ORDER EXTENDING Dispositive Motion Deadline to September 3, 2017, In Light of Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/4/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 43 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit Production of Documents to Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/20/17. Plaintiff's discovery responses due: May 24, 2017; Discovery Cut-off: June 14, 2017. (Marrujo, C)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 41 ORDER Granting Defendant's Request to Extend the Discovery Deadline to May 8, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/17. (Hellings, J)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 36 37 Motions Relating to Alleged Due Process Violations signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/06/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 5/11/2017. (Flores, E)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order 30 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to administratively terminate 25 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT pursuant to 29 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Answer to Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/09/2016. (Flores, E)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER denying second 21 Motion to add Defendant, Barrios to action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/7/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER denying 16 Motion to amend complaint to add a new defendant and new claim signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/30/2016. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Martinez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. S. Wadkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?