Green et al v. Bakersfield Memorial Hospital, et al.
Plaintiff: Leonard Green and Janice Green
Defendant: Bakersfield Memorial Hospital and Dignity Health
Case Number: 1:2016cv00450
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/10/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISCHARGING 37 Order to Show Cause; ORDER to the Parties to File Their Stipulated Dismissal No Later than July 7, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/29/2017. (Hall, S)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER to DEFENDANTS AND THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Their Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/23/2017. Show Cause Response due by 6/27/2017. (Hall, S)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order granting stipulation for additional time to dismiss the action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/16/2017. Stipulated Dismissal Deadline: 6/21/2017. (Rosales, O)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation for Additional Time to Dismiss the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 6/13/2017. (Hall, S)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation for Additional Time to Dismiss the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 5/29/2017. (Hall, S)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AFTER 28 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 4/28/2017. All other pending deadlines, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 26 Ex Parte Request to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/2017. (Hall, S)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 22 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2017. (Hall, S)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/20/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 10/26/2016; Non-Expert 3/24/2017; Expert 6/9/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set fo r 1/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/23/2017; Hearing by 7/21/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/23/2017; Hearing by 8/8/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AFTER STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/12/2016. Supplemental joint report due by 9/28/2016. Further Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONTINUING 6 Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2016. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 7/20/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Bakersfield Memorial Hospital, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakersfield Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Green
Represented By: Christopher H. Knauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Green
Represented By: Christopher H. Knauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?