Broussard v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Shirley Broussard
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00462
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER of DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 9/13/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 9/11/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER VACATING ALL Deadlines and Hearings including Trial, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 8/31/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 5/23/2017. MOTIONS SUBMITTED: denying 44 Motion to Vacate ; granting 45 Motion in Limine; denying 46 Motion in Limine; granting 47 Motion in Limine; denying 48 Motion in Limine; denying 49 Motion in Limine; denying 50 Motion in Limine; granting 51 Motion in Limine; granting 52 Motion in Limine; granting 53 Motion in Limine; granting 54 Motion in Limine; granting 57 Motion in Limine; denying 58 Motion in Limine; denying 62 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 63 Motion in Limine; denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Valdez, E)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER re 56 Motion in Limine, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 5/19/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ***DUPLICATE TO DOCKET # 130 PLEASE DISREGARD*** ORDER DENYING Request to file Under Seal 128 , signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 5/5/2017. (Kusamura, W) Modified on 5/8/2017 (Kusamura, W).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 128 Request to Seal Document, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 05/05/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 5/1/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING unopposed motions 55 Motion in Limine #11 ; 59 Motion in Limine #15, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/27/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING 3M Documents to be SEALED, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/21/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 77 Request to Seal, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/14/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re: Motions in Limine, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/12/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re: Sealing Exhibits, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re Status Conference of 4/4/2017, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 4/6/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER setting a Status Conference (VTC) set for 4/4/2017 at 10:00 AM (PT) 11:00 AM (MT) in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 3/21/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED ORDER re 32 Scheduling Order signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 3/3/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 3/1/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER of Reassignment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/22/2017. This action is reassigned to District Judge Sam E. Haddon. The new case number is 1:16-cv-00462-SEH.(Lundstrom, T)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 Second Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/17/2017. (Hall, S)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 22 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2017. (Hall, S)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER Concerning 3M Documents and Information as Modified by the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/6/2017. (Hall, S)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/27/2016. Consent/Decline Deadline 7/7/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 9/26/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 7/18/2016; Non-Expert 3/27/2017; Expert 3/27/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/4/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/10/2017; Hearing by 5/8/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadli nes: Filed by 5/24/2017; Hearing by 7/5/2017. Settlement Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Broussard
Represented By: Stephen L. Backus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?