Thornton v. Grissom et al
Plaintiff: Simon Thornton
Defendant: D. Grissom, P. Cruz, D. Stanley, K. Gonzales, B. John, A. Mohammed, Regino, S. Tallerico and Custer
Case Number: 1:2016cv00498
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 79 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED and the Clerk of Court be Directed to Close the Case re 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/15/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust be Granted in Part, Denied in Part 79 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/13/2019: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/7/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; Clerk to Send Local Rule 281 to Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/17/18. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing: November 20, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6 (MJS); Jury Trial: January 12, 2021, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4 (LJO). (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 281)(Marrujo, C)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER WITHDRAWING 69 Motion to Compel; ORDER GRANTING 72 Motion to Withdraw 69 Motion to Compel Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/21/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING 60 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 59 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/18/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER adopting 58 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 50 Motion to Dismiss; and directing Defendants to file an answer igned by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/4/2018. Answer due within 14-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 50 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be DENIED Without Prejudice re 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/6/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 44 Motion for Summary Judgment ORDER ADOPTING 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/25/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's Second 44 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/20/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to DENY Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 34 , 36 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/30/17: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING 31 RENEWED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and DISMISSING Non-Cognizable Claims With Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/5/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING 35 Motion for Jury Trial; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED Without Prejudice re 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/5/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 32 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/4/17: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Vacating 29 Order to Show Cause; and RENEWED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Non-Cognizable Claims with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/27/17. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (1) VACATING 22 Findings and Recommendations; (2) DIRECTING Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint; and (3) GRANTING Request for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/23/16. (Marrujo, C)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions for Appointment of Counsel 14 , 17 , 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/8/16. (Verduzco, M)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Non-Cognizable Claims with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/7/16. Referred to Judge Ishii; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/16/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Grissom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tallerico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?