Black v. Jaime et al
Plaintiff: Michael Black
Defendant: G. Jaime, Waddle, Neibert, Walinga and Brubaker
Case Number: 1:2016cv00503
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that Inmate Michael Black is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/12/2017. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 09:00 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 22 Request for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/24/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/15/16. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Jaime et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brubaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?