Galindo v. ABS Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sergio Galindo
Defendant: ABS Global, Inc., Pro Vita Animal Health LLC and Pro Vita Eurotech Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00506
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to CLOSE the Action Based upon the Parties' Stipulation to Dismiss this Action with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order VACATING hearing and Order on Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Extension of Time, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/9/2017. (Opposition or notice of non-opposition Deadline: 11/27/2017; Reply due by 12/4/2017) The November 13, 2017 Motion for Summary Judgment hearing date is VACATED (Rosales, O)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Closing Case to as Pro Vita Animal Health LLC and Pro Vita Eurotech Ltd., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/2017. (Hall, S)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/19/2016. Settlement Conference set for 12/19/2016 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/18/2016. Consent/Decline Deadline 8/8/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/17/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 8/8/2016; Non-Expert 5/26/2017; Expert 8/4/2017. Mi d-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/7/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/18/2017; Hearing by 9/15/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadline s: Filed by 9/29/2017; Hearing by 11/13/2017. Settlement Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galindo v. ABS Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Galindo
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABS Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Vita Animal Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Vita Eurotech Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?