Interval Equipment Solutions, Inc. v. Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Interval Equipment Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00512
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER directing Clerk to close case re 38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/11/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER to extend deadline to file dispositional documents. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The deadline to file dispositional documents set forth in the Courts March 2, 2017 Order is extended; the Parties are directed to file dispositional documents by Monday, April 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/4/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT; VACATING DATES AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/2/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/27/2017. (Kusamura, W)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Request to Extend Discovery Deadlines 28 . The deadline for completion of non-expert discovery is EXTENDED from January 31, 2017 to April 3, 2017; the deadline for expert disclosures is EXTENDED from February 21, 2017 to Ap ril 3, 2017; the deadline for supplemental expert disclosures is EXTENDED from March 23, 2017 to May 1, 2017; and the deadline for completion of expert discovery is EXTENDED from April 20, 2017 to May 1, 2017. All remaining dates, including the pretrial conference and trial dates, shall remain as currently set. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/2/2017. (Thorp, J)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/19/2016. (Kusamura, W)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to Amend and DENYING AS MOOT 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/16/2016. Defendant shall have twenty-one (21) days to respond to the first amended complaint. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interval Equipment Solutions, Inc. v. Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interval Equipment Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Robert Barrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Benedicto
Represented By: R. Brendan Fee, PHV
Represented By: Brendan Eugene Radke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?