Linde, LLC v. Valley Protein, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linde, LLC
Defendant: Valley Protein, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00527
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING 80 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/3/2019. (Apodaca, P)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Vacating Status Conference, Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 77 and Entering Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/5/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; Status Conference to be held August 20, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before the undersigned, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/11/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/19/2019. (The parties' briefing shall be limited to fifteen pages each. Upon submission of this further briefing, the motion will be re-submitted for decision.) (Thorp, J)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING a continuance of the following dates: Dispositive Motion filing deadline extended to 8/7/2018; Settlement Conference currently set for 6/28/2018 is continued to 11/8/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magist rate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Pretrial Conference currently set for 8/6/2018 is continued to 12/3/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; and Jury Trial currently set for 10/30/2018 is continued and will now be held on 2/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/7/2018. (Rooney, M)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures and setting Settlement Conference for 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/2/2018. (Rooney, M)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER rejecting stipulation to extend the dispositive motion deadline and setting a status conference as follows: 1) The stipulation and proposed order filed on December 8, 2017, is REJECTED and shall have no force and effect on the current schedule; 2) The Court hereby sets a Telephonic Status Conference for Tuesday, January 23, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. To appear telephonically, the parties are directed to use the following dial-in num ber and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. The Court will address the proposed modification of the dispositive motion deadline at that time; and 3) The Court will permit the parties to conduct depositions outside of the non-expert discovery deadline as proposed in the parties' stipulation. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/11/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines: Non-Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2017; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/17/2017; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/17/201 7; Expert Discovery due by 12/18/2017; Dispositive Motions filed by 2/2/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2018 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial set for 8/7/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/26/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order rejecting stipulation to extend discovery schedule; Order setting status conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/19/2017. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/26/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) The joint report shall be filed on the docket no later than twenty-four hours prior to the status conference set by this order. (Rosales, O)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Permitting Filing of Counterclaim and First Amended Answer (Docs. 20 23 26 ), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/21/2017. (Hearing on motions currently set for 3/7/2017 is VACATED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linde, LLC v. Valley Protein, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linde, LLC
Represented By: Evan B Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Protein, LLC
Represented By: Russell K Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?