Houston Casualty Company v. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Houston Casualty Company
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Preferred Contractors Insurance Company, RRG, LLC, The Phoenix Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Financial Pacific Insurance Company and MP Nexlevel of California, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00535
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/19/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES FOR TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AGAINST MP NEXLEVEL OF CALIFORNIA, INC. signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 19, 2017. (Munoz, I)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES FOR PLAINTIFF HOUSTON CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 17, 2017. (Munoz, I)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline with Respect to MP Nexlevel of California, Inc.'s Counterclaim Against Bridge Masters, Inc. signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/16/2017. It is hereby ordered that Bridge Masters shall answer or otherwise respond to MPC's Counterclaim no later than May 19, 2017. This order does not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court order. (Valdez, E)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER on stipulation setting aside default of Horizon Underground, Inc. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (ECF No. 161 ), and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the default entered against Defendant Horizon Underground, Inc. on March 3, 2017 (ECF No. 134 ) is hereby vacated and set aside. Defendant Horizon Underground, Inc. shall file a responsive pleading within fifteen (15) calendar days from the date of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/2/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER on stipulation regarding Crum and Forster's answer to plaintiff's first amended complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Third Cause of Action in Travelers' Cross-Claim Against MP Nexlevel of California, Inc., signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/14/17. (Hellings, J)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER AS FOLLOWS: Non-Expert Discovery due by 8/7/2017; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/7/2017; Rebuttal Expert Designation of Witnesses due by 10/6/2017; Expert Discovery due by 11/6/2017; Dispositive M otions filed by 12/20/2017; Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2018 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 6/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/19/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 80 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/3/17: Motion is GRANTED; Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before January 16, 2017. (Hellings, J)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Strike with Leave to Amend; Traveler's declaratory Judgment counterclaim against HCC is STRICKEN; Any Ameneded Counter-Complaint shall be filed on or before December 29, 2016, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/29/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER governing the use and disclosure of confidential information. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/17/2016. (Rooney, M)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER APPROVING the stipulation to extend Houston Casualty Company's responsive pleading deadline with respect to Travelers' counterclaim. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/7/2016. (Rooney, M)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation, document 56 , as follows: Houston Casualty Company shall answer or otherwise plead to Travelers' Counterclaim within 14 days of this Court's entry of a ruling on HCC's Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Crum and Forster's Counterclaim (documents 37 and 38 ).Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/26/2016. (Rooney, M)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER RE Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Strike signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/25/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation to extend the responsive pleading deadline from 7/12/2016 to 8/26/2016 for receipt of plaintiff's responsive pleading to defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America's counterclaim, document 28 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/2016. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Casualty Company v. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert J. Bates, PHV
Represented By: Jordon S. Steinway, PHV
Represented By: Amy Katrin Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin P. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company, RRG, LLC
Represented By: Gene Emery Royce
Represented By: Christian William Schmitthenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Tittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Pacific Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP Nexlevel of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?