Williams v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Winston W. Williams
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00537
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TERMINATING Experian Information Solutions, Inc. as a Defendant and CLOSING the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/25/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TERMINATING Wells Fargo Bank N.A. as a Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/18/2017. (Rooney, M)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines: Non-expert discovery due by April 14, 2017; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure due by May 5, 2017; Defendants' Expert Disclosure due by May 19, 2017; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by June 2, 2017, with all other dates to remain as previously set. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/16/2016. (Rooney, M)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order GRANTING stipulated Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/13/2016. (Rosales, O)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/11/16: Pursuant to the Stipulation, all claims against Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC are dismissed, with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston W. Williams
Represented By: Stuart Michael Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?