Williams v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Brett Lee Williams
Defendant: T. E. Hill, J. Lewis, C. Kerie, R.J. Rackley, T. Kamura-Yip, K. Yount, E. Flores, I. Ogbuehi and B. Lee
Case Number: 1:2016cv00540
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/1/19. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 41 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ( 35 , 36 ), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/21/2018: The Motion is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Be Denied 35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/18/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/13/2018. (Hellings, J)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER on Plaintiff's 31 Notice of Corrections signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Stay and Abeyance 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/5/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why this Case should not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute, 10 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 0828/17. Show Cause Response due 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Plaintiff to SUBMIT Affidavit Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure; Twenty-One Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/20/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 13 Motion for a Docket Correction without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND,signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/20/2016. Amended Complaint due by 7/25/2016 (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Lee Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. E. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Kerie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Kamura-Yip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Yount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Ogbuehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?