Cortinas v. McCabe, et al.
Plaintiff: Larry William Cortinas
Defendant: Conall McCabe, Pierrette Lenoir, Olga Beregovskaya, Chetana Sisodia, Patricia Rouch, E Clark and Vogel
Case Number: 1:2016cv00558
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that Inmate Larry William Cortinas, CDCR# P-09908 is no Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/23/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 01/11/2018. Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2018 at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 55 Request for Ruling; Denying Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Supplement; and Striking Lodged Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 01/09/2018. (Flores, E)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting 52 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to grant Defendants' 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for failure to exhaust administrative remedies signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/28/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 49 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 41 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies be GRANTED re 13 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/13/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time for Filing and Hearing Motion; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to: (1) DENY 24 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and/or Protective Order; (2) DENY 32 Plaintiff's Moti on for a Court Ordered Telephonic Conference; (3) DENY 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and (4) DENY 38 Plaintiff's Request for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order re 13 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/6/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER (1) DENYING 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Proceed With Discovery; (2) DENYING 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; (3) DENYING 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order; and (4) DENYING 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Conduct Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/1/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE Defendants' 17 Request for Clarification of Screening Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/17/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 11 : Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before January 6, 2017. The Court will not grant any further extensions of time. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this deadline, his case will proceed on only the claims found cognizable in the Screening Order, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/9/2016. (Valdez, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortinas v. McCabe, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry William Cortinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conall McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierrette Lenoir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Beregovskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chetana Sisodia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Rouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?