Luna et al v. County of Kern et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Luna, Alicia Puentes, Dorothy Velasquez and Gary Rodriguez
Defendant: County of Kern, Kern County Board of Supervisors, Mick Gleason, Zack Scrivner, Mike Maggard, David Couch, Leticia Perez, John Nilon and Mary B. Bedard
Case Number: 1:2016cv00568
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT APPROVING AGREEMENT FOR STIPULATED ORDER, SETTLEMENT & RELEASE OF CLAIMS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on April 11, 2018. (Doc. No. 206)(Munoz, I)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER of Dismissal, Directing the Clerk of the Court to Terminate Defendants Mick Gleason, Zack Scrivner, Mike Maggard, David Couch, Leticia Perez, John Nilon, Mary B. Bedard and Mary B. Bedard, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/4/18. Mick Gleason, Zack Scrivner, Mike Maggard, David Couch, Leticia Perez, John Nilon, Mary B. Bedard and Mary B. Bedard Terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/2018. (Hall, S)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/28/2018. Hearing on status of settlement set for 3/30/2018 at 02:00 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING Substitution of Counsel 194 195 196 197 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/26/2018. (Hall, S)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/23/2018. A status conference with respect to scheduling that phase of the litigation is now set for March 6, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5 before the undersign ed. Counsel may appear telephonically by contacting Courtroom Deputy Renee Gaumnitz at RGaumnitz@caed.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours prior to the status conference. Status reports addressing the parties' proposal for those further proceedings shall be filed and served by March 1, 2018. (Thorp, J)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 FINAL PRETIRLA ORDER, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re Defendants' 99 Motion in Limine to Limit or Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Albert Camarillo, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/19/2017. (Defendant's motion in limine to exclude Dr. Camarillo's testimony is now denied in its entirety.)(Gaumnitz, R)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER After Informal Telephonic Conference re Discovery Dispute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/5/2017. (Hall, S)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation Regarding Discovery and Pretrial Schedule, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/6/2017. (Motions to exclude expert testimony due by 9/15/2017; oppositions to Daubert motions due by 10/2/2017; any replies in support of Daubert motions due by 10/9/2017; Hearing on Daubert motions and Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2017, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Bench Trial set for 12/5/2017, at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/1/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER After Informal Telephonic Conference re Discovery Dispute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/11/2017. (Hall, S)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/13/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/20/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 10/4/2016; Non-Expert and Expert 2/10/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/20/2017; Hearing by 3/27/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/7/2017; Hearing by 5/16/2017. Settlement Conference set for 3/1/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Denying Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/2/2016. (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna et al v. County of Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Luna
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Puentes
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Velasquez
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Represented By: Denise Hulett
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Gleason
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Scrivner
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Maggard
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Couch
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Perez
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nilon
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary B. Bedard
Represented By: Christopher Elliott Skinnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?