Xiong v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lee Lee Xiong
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00582
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/18/2018. (Hall, S)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and remanding the action pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and directing entry of judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 a Second Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/24/2017. Defendant's brief due by 4/26/2017. (Hall, S)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 13 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc and Amending the Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/2017. (Hall, S)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents, and Scheduling Order; ORDER DIRECTING Service of the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiong v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Lee Xiong
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?