Montalvo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Phillips J. Montalvo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00606
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Affirming Agency's Denial of Benefits and Ordering Judgment for Commissioner signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/27/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause (Doc. 21). ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Opening Brief Nunc Pro Tunc. Defendant's opposition to the opening brief, if any, shall be filed on or before May 19, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/21/2017. (Herman, H)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute. RESPONSE DUE: April 19, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/12/2017. (Herman, H)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and including March 28, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief; Defendant shall have an extension of time to April 27, 2017, to file an opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by Plaintiff shall be filed on or before May 12, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/23/2017. (Thorp, J)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule; ORDER for Plaintiff to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief to February 22, 2017; and that Defendant shall have until March 24, 2017, to file her opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff will be due April 10, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2017. (Herman, H)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule: that Plaintiff may have an extension of time to provide Defendant with Plaintiffs Settlement Letter Brief to and including October 25, 2016; Defendant may have an extension of time to November 29, 2016 to file her response. All other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/27/2016. (Herman, H)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/02/2016. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montalvo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillips J. Montalvo
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?