J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Anthony Lopez and Score Sports Cafe and Lounge
Case Number: 1:2016cv00607
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Fourth Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time to Complete Service (Doc. 15): Plaintiff is granted an additional ten (10) days from todays date to effectuate service of theSummons and Complaint filed i n this matter, or to file a motion for service by publication, or in the alternative, a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendants Michael Anthony Lopez and Scores Sports Caf and Lounge, an unknown business entity doing business as Scores Sports Caf and Lounge, where service has not been made or service by publication requested. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/23/2017. (Herman, H)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Third Ex-Parte Application for an Order Extending Time to Complete Service (Doc. 13) and Continue Scheduling Conference Hearing: Plaintiff is granted an additional thirty (30) days from todays date to effectuat e service of the Summons and Complaint filed in this matter, or to file a motion for service by publication, or in the alternative, a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendants Michael Anthony Lopez and Scores Sports Caf and Lounge, an unknown bu siness entity doing business as Scores Sports Caf and Lounge, where service has not been made or service by publication requested. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Scheduling Conference is continued from January 11, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. to March 2, 2017 at 9:00 AM in courtroom 8 before Judge McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/2016. (Herman, H)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application (Doc. 11) for an Order Extending Time to Complete Service: Plaintiff is granted an additional forty-five (45) days from todays date to effectuate service of the Summons and Complaint filed in this matter, or to file a motion for service by publication, or in the alternative, a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Michael Anthony Lopez and Score Sports Caf and Lounge, where service has not been made or service by publication requeste d. FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Initial Scheduling Conference is continued from November 1, 2016 to January 11, 2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/29/2016. (Herman, H)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Application (Doc. 8). (1.) Plaintiffs ex parte application for an Order Extending Time to Complete Service is GRANTED; and (2.) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), the time for service is extended an additional sixty ( 60) days to September 26, 2016. By that date, Plaintiff shall either effectuate service, file a motion for service by publication, or file a notice of voluntary dismissal if service has not been made or service by publication has not been requested. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/29/2016. (Herman, H)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application (Doc. 6) - Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 7/26/2016 to Thursday, September 8, 2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Jud ge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference, one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/20/2016. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Score Sports Cafe and Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?