Lo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Molly Lo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00610
Filed: April 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 31 Counsel's Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/10/2019. (Hall, S)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/6/2017. (Hall, S)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Remanding the Action Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405; ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Molly Lo and Against Defendant Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order GRANTING Plaintiff's 25 Application to file a late reply brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/7/2017. (Rosales, O)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISCHARGING 18 the Order to Show Cause Dated April 14, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/1/2017. (Hall, S)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to DEFENDANT to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/14/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File a Late Opening Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/2017. (Hall, S)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/31/2017. Opening brief due by 2/26/2017. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Lo
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Heather Moss, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?