Keller v. N.K.S.P.
Plaintiff: John Keller
Defendant: N.K.S.P. and Special Appearance
Case Number: 1:2016cv00613
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Action With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/9/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Edward Jacob Lubarsky is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/6/2017 setting Settlement Conference for 10/27/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Lundstrom, T)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER APPOINTING LIMITED PURPOSE COUNSEL FOR SETTLEMENT. Attorney, Edward Jacob Lubarsky appointed for John Keller signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/21/16. (Marrujo, C)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Office of the Attorney General to Address Plaintiff's Request for Access to Law Library Within Fourteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/9/16. (Gonzalez, R)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Response to Plaintiff's Letter to Court 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/25/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/12/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/5/2016. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. N.K.S.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.K.S.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Appearance
Represented By: Michelle L. Angus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?