Carolyn E. Miner v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Carolyn E. Miner
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00626
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re: 26 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/17/2017. (Kusamura, W)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 18 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERING Clerk to close this case in light of Plaintiff's Rule 41(a)(1) Voluntary Dismissal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/21/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 15 Ex Parte Request for Additional Time to File a Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/15/2016. (Hall, S)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Open a New Case signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/30/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING Further Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/5/2016. Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue a Summons as to the First Amended Complaint; Plaintiff SHALL accomplish service and file proof by 9/9/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/6/2016. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carolyn E. Miner v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn E. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Represented By: Mary Helene McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?