Myers v. Pulido et al
Plaintiff: Dallas Joshua James Myers
Defendant: L. Pulido, S. Tolson, A. Valenzuela and D. Jorge
Case Number: 1:2016cv00638
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ADOPTING 57 Findings and Recommendations, Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/18/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Regarding Notice to the Court to Receive Settlement Money 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/23/17. (Hellings, J)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion and DIRECTING Defendants to Serve Plaintiff With a Copy of Signed Settlement Agreement, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/17. Five Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 Plaintiff's Motion to be Transported to Mule Creek State Prison and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to E-mail Orders to CSP-Corcoran Transport Officials signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Terminate Pending Motions and Deadlines, and Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISCHARGING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testficandum as to Inmate Dallas Joshua James Myers, CDCR #AX-7238, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Rescind Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, or in the Alternative to Allow Settlement Conference by Telephone signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/1/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/2017. Settlement Conference set for 6/9/2017 at 08:30 AM at California State Prison, Corcoran, before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Jessen, A)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 28 Motion to Stay Discovery; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Notice Concerning Filing Fees 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/17. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Re-Serve Discovery and Scheduling Order 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2017. (Hellings, J)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Re-Captioning Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/16. (Hellings, J)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Waive PLRA Filing Fees 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/16. (Hellings, J)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying 15 Motion for Court to Accept Documents that Support Claim on Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/16. (Verduzco, M)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISREGARDING AS MOOT 11 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/27/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Pulido et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Joshua James Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Pulido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Jorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?