Bealer v. Secretary of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Antwoine Bealer
Defendant: Secretary of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and Warden of Kern Valley State Prison
Case Number: 1:2016cv00671
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ADOPTING 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; ORDER GRANTING 59 Motion for Summary Judgment ; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 60 , 65 , 68 , 69 , 73 and 74 ; ORDERED Case DISMISSED Without Prejudice, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/28/2019.CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust be Granted in Full; (2) All Other Pending Motions be Denied as Moot; (3) This Case be Dismissed Without Prejudice 59 , 60 , 65 , 68 , 69 , 73 , 74 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/7/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RELIEVING Plaintiff of Requirement to Submit CDCR Form 602 Documentation signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/20/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Complete and Return Service Documents within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/9/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief Under Rule 60 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/4/2018. (Jessen, A)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief Under Rule 60 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/14/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/2/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 24 Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING IN PART Plaintiff's 18 First Amended Complaint, with leave to amended signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/21/2017. Amended Complaint due by 5/30/2017.(Lundstrom, T)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/17/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/15/2017 recommending that 6 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING 1 COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/16/2016. First Amended Complaint due by 1/23/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bealer v. Secretary of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwoine Bealer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Kern Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?