David Estrada v. Vanderpoel et al
Plaintiff: David Estrada
Defendant: J. Vanderpoel, A. Maxfield, J. Pasion, M. Sexton, M. Voong, F.R. Pimentel, K.J. Allen, R.L. Briggs, D. Davey and J. Beard
Case Number: 1:2016cv00673
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case re 44 Stipulation signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/6/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that Inmate David Estrada, CDCR#T-42165 is no longer needed as a participant in these proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/17/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses be Granted in Part and Denied in Part signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/19/2017. (Flores, E)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE on November 17, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. at CSP-Corcoran,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/22/2017. (Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng at CSP-Corcoran) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Directing Prison to Make Prisoner Available for Mandatory Conference in Civil Rights Action signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 27 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses Be Granted in Part and Denied in Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER That This Action Proceed Only on Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendants Vanderpoel, Maxfield and Sexton for Violation of Fifth, Eighth, and Fourteenth Amendments and All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2017. R.L. Briggs, D. Davey, J. Pasion, F.R. Pimentel, M. Voong, K.J. Allen and J. Beard terminated. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Estrada v. Vanderpoel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vanderpoel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Pasion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.R. Pimentel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?