Taylor v. Gregory
Plaintiff: Shauntae Taylor
Defendant: J. Gregory
Case Number: 1:2016cv00698
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 44 Request for Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/14/18. (Gonzalez, R)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Requiring a Response to Plaintiff's 44 Request for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/10/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER requiring a response to Plaintiff's filing regarding Settlement Agreement 39 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/28/2017. Defendant Gregory to file Response with in 21-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Sanctions against Kern County State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/27/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER requiring Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2017. Defendant's Response due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/21/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISCHARGING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Shauntae Taylor, CDCR# G-52410, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/18/17. (Marrujo, C)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 30 Request for Information, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/14/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request to Attend Settlement Conference By Video 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/30/17. (Hellings, J)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Shauntae Taylor, CDCR# G-52410, for Settlement Conference on September 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., at Corcoran State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/18/2017. (Flores, E)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on September 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. at CSP-Corcoran,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/24/17. (Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Consent of Magistrate Judge Reassignment, and Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Defendant's Decline of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/01/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauntae Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?