June 6, 2022 |
Filing
91
ORDER RE: Stipulated Dismissal of Entire Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/06/2022. CASE CLOSED. (Maldonado, C)
|
January 25, 2022 |
Filing
72
PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/24/2022. Motions in Limine: Filed by 2/18/2022; Response by 2/25/2022; Reply by 3/3/2022; Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. He aring on Jury Instructions, Verdict Form, Outstanding Pretrial Issues set for 3/18/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hall, S)
|
January 20, 2022 |
Filing
69
ORDER ASSIGNING District Judge Dale A. Drozd to Case for Limited Purpose of Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Consent, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/20/2022. (Rivera, O)
|
February 9, 2021 |
Filing
62
ORDER GRANTING 61 Stipulation Regarding Trial Setting, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/9/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
June 3, 2020 |
Filing
57
STIPULATION and ORDER 56 to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/2/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
December 23, 2019 |
Filing
53
STIPULATION and ORDER TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the Parties hereto through their respective attorneys of record that the following be continued as follows: Expert Discovery Cutoff: April 6, 2020; Joint Pre Trial Statement due by May 11, 2020. Pretrial Conference currently set for 12/30/2019 is CONTINUED to 5/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial currently set for 2/10/2020 is CONTINUED to 6/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/23/2019. (Apodaca, P)
|
October 29, 2019 |
Filing
51
STIPULATION and ORDER 50 Dismissing Certain Claims with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/28/2019. (Hall, S)
|
September 17, 2019 |
Filing
49
STIPULATION and ORDER 48 Granted in Part to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by 11/18/2019. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 12/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
August 22, 2019 |
Filing
47
STIPULATION and ORDER 46 to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/22/2019. Expert Discovery Cutoff 11/14/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/17/2019; Hearing by 10/15/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/28/2019; Hearing by 12/13/2019. (Hall, S)
|
June 20, 2019 |
Filing
44
AMENDED Stipulation and Order for physical examination of Plaintiff Gilberto Fajardo, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2019. (Rosales, O.)
|
June 19, 2019 |
Filing
42
STIPULATION and ORDER 41 for Physical Examination of Plaintiff Gilberto Fajardo, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/2019. (Hall, S)
|
May 17, 2019 |
Filing
40
STIPULATION and ORDER 39 to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/17/2019. Expert discovery cutoff 10/14/2019. (Hall, S)
|
May 30, 2018 |
Filing
36
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/30/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline 9/14/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 6/18/2018; Non-Expert 6/18/2019; Expert 8/12/2019. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/27/2019; Hearing by 9/24/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/7/2019; Hearing by 11/18 /2019. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
April 23, 2018 |
Filing
31
ORDER Requiring a Joint Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/23/2018. Joint report due by 5/4/2018. (Hall, S)
|
February 22, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER Requiring a Joint Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2018. Joint report due by 3/30/2018. (Hall, S)
|
September 22, 2017 |
Filing
24
ORDER DISCHARGING 22 the Order to Show Cause Dated September 15, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/22/2017. (Hall, S)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for the Parties' Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/15/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
|
July 10, 2017 |
Filing
20
ORDER Requiring a Joint Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/10/2017. Status report due by 7/17/2017. (Hall, S)
|
June 30, 2016 |
Filing
14
ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Stay the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2016. All pending dates and hearings are VACATED. CASE STAYED. (Hall, S)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing
10
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE; new case number is 1:16-cv-699 JLT, signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd, MJ on 06/20/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
|