Johnson v. White, et al.
Plaintiff: Vance Edward Johnson
Defendant: White, M. Wilson and Carr
Case Number: 1:2016cv00710
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/12/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Discharging Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Vance Edward Johnson, CDCR #P-48409, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/18/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting Defendants' 31 Motion to Modify the Discover and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Inmate Vance Edward Johnson, CDCR# P-48409 on September 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. at California State Prison, Corcoran, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/17/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2017. Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 08:30 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Denying Defendants' 17 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status, and Directing Defendants to File a Response to the Complaint within Thirty Days signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/26/2017. (Flores, E)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 17 MOTION to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/6/17. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCREENING ORDER; ORDERED that Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment Due Process Claim be DISMISSED WITHOUTLEAVE TO AMEND; ORDERED that no later than October 25, 2016, Plaintiff required to file a written response, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/121/16. (Case Management Deadline: 10/25/2016) (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. White, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?